This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:35:17 (UTC).

Robin Warren Properties, LLC v. Smith

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Robin Warren Properties, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M Ray, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Warren Properties, LLC

Defendant

Michelle D. Smith

Atlanta, GA 30326

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Richards Grimes

Attorney at Lefkoff Duncan Grimes McSwain & Hass, P.C.

3520 Piedmont Road, N.E., Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30305-1511

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTIFICATION OF FILING ACCEPTANCE from DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #11 Electronic Remand. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

11 #1

Filing Receipt (Status: Submitting)

#11

(#11) CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #10 Remand Order. (Attachments: #1 Filing Receipt (Status: Submitting)) (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER adopting #5 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of this Court. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. In so holding, Defendant Smith's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction #8 and subsequent rescission of the motion #9 are rendered MOOT. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/11/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#9

(#9) (Rescission construed by the Clerk as a) MOTION to Rescind the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#8

(#8) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#7

(#7) Additional Salient Document to the #2 Notice of Removal by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/17/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#5

(#5) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: RECOMMENDING that this action, #2 Notice of Removal, be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/17/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/21/2018.) filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Disqualify Judge Gary LeShaw FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/20/2018.) by Michelle D. Smith. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Michelle D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTIFICATION OF FILING ACCEPTANCE from DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #11 Electronic Remand. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #10 Remand Order. (Attachments: #1 Filing Receipt (Status: Submitting)) (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michelle D. Smith re #10 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER adopting #5 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of this Court. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. In so holding, Defendant Smith's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction #8 and subsequent rescission of the motion #9 are rendered MOOT. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/11/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge, #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M Ray II. (jpa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of the Emergency #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #9 MOTION to Rescind the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge William M Ray II. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (Rescission construed by the Clerk as a) MOTION to Rescind the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Additional Salient Document to the #2 Notice of Removal by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michelle D. Smith re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/17/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/17/2019 within the #5 R&R. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: RECOMMENDING that this action, #2 Notice of Removal, be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/17/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/21/2018.) filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Disqualify Judge Gary LeShaw FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/20/2018.) by Michelle D. Smith. (bnp) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Michelle D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Michelle D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less