This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 13:39:47 (UTC).

Robin v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Robin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01233

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Robin

Defendants

Aearo Technologies LLC

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Defendant Attorneys

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

S Jamal Faleel

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Jerry W Blackwell

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Certified Copy by Clerk of NDFL

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-65) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers.(lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #1 Certified Copy by Clerk of NDFL) (lmb). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7743460) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (lmb) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-65) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers.(lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #1 Certified Copy by Clerk of NDFL) (lmb). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1233 JRT/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7743460) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less