This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:44:55 (UTC).

Robin Riha v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Robin Riha filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08433

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBIN RIHA

Defendants

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

HCA, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan B Grabarsky

Attorney at DarrasLaw

3257 East Guasti Road Suite 300

Ontario, CA 91761-1227

Frank N Darras

Attorney at DarrasLaw

3257 East Guasti Road Suite 300

Ontario, CA 91761-1227

Phillip S Bather

Attorney at DarrasLaw

3257 East Guasti Road Suite 300

Ontario, CA 91761-1227

Defendant Attorney

Jason A James

Attorney at Meserve Mumper and Hughes LLP

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1860

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HCA, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robin Riha, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist of C.T. Corporation-Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 12/17/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Robin Riha. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of the Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement, the court orders the action dismissed without prejudice #14 . The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within sixty days from the date of this Order. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require approval of the court. All pending dates and deadlines are hereby vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of the Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement, the court orders the action dismissed without prejudice #14 . The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within sixty days from the date of this Order. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require approval of the court. All pending dates and deadlines are hereby vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Robin Riha. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 12/17/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robin Riha, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist of C.T. Corporation-Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HCA, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ROBIN RIHA. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ROBIN RIHA. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ROBIN RIHA, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ROBIN RIHA. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32212440 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff ROBIN RIHA. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party ROBIN RIHA(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCA, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. James