This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 10:18:40 (UTC).

Robichaux v. Southern Fidelity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Robichaux filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Lance M Africk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02921

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John C. Robichaux

Defendant

Southern Fidelity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kirk Reasonover

Attorney at Reasonover & Berg LLC

400 Poydras St., Suite 1980

New Orleans, LA 70130

Nicholas H. Berg

Attorney at Reasonover & Berg LLC

400 Poydras St., Suite 1980

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Jonas Peyton Baker

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm, LLC

900 W. Causeway Approach, Suite A, Mandeville

Mandeville, LA 70471

Matthew D. Monson

Attorney at Monson Law Firm, LLC

900 West Causeway Approach, Suite A

Mandeville, LA 70471

Brett F. Willie

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm

900 W. Causeway Approach, Suite A

Mandeville, LA 70471

Kevin P. Riche

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm

900 W. Causeway Approach, Suite A, 70471

Mandeville, LA 70471

Joshua H Dierker

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith

#3 Sanctuary Boulevard, 3Rd Floor

Mandeville, LA 70471

John D. Mineo, IV

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm, LLC

900 W. Causeway Approach, A, 70471

Mandeville, LA 70448

Rachel L. Flarity

Attorney at Monson Law Firm, LLC

900 West Causeway Approach, Suite A

Mandeville, LA 70471

 

Court Documents

8 #12

Exhibit 9

8 #11

Exhibit 8

8 #10

Exhibit 7

8 #9

Exhibit 6

8 #8

Exhibit 5

8 #7

Exhibit 4

8 #6

Exhibit 3

8 #5

Exhibit 2

8 #4

Exhibit 1

8 #3

Exhibit A

8 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

(#8) MOTION to Compel Appraisal, Appoint Umpire, Disqualify Plaintiff's Designated Appraisers and Stay Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal by Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Willie, Brett) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/9/2020.(blg) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

6 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 3/29/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2020 9:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(tj) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit C

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Compel Appraisal, Appoint Umpire, Disqualify Plaintiff's Designated Appraisers and Stay Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal by Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Willie, Brett) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/9/2020.(blg) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 3/29/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2020 9:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(tj) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Fidelity Insurance Company.(Monson, Matthew) Modified link on 11/24/2020 (mp). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Southern Fidelity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Southern Fidelity Holding, LLC for Southern Fidelity Insurance Company (Baker, Jonas) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2020-6766 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8566618) filed by Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 COMPLIANCE with 28 USC 1447(b), #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)Attorney Jonas Peyton Baker added to party Southern Fidelity Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Baker, Jonas) Modified text on 10/27/2020 (mp). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less