This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2022 at 09:22:29 (UTC).

Robichaux v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Robichaux filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susie Morgan and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00610

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Felton Robichaux

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Cross Claimants and Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Eagle, Inc.

Union Carbide Corporation

International Paper Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Maryland Casualty Insurance Company

Uniroyal, Inc.

Sentry Insurance Company

Employers Insurance Company of Wassau

Viacom CBS, Inc.

3M Company

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Imo Industries, Inc.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Eagle, Inc.

Union Carbide Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Maryland Casualty Insurance Company

Uniroyal, Inc.

Sentry Insurance Company

Employers Insurance Company of Wassau

Viacom CBS, Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants and Defendants

International Paper Company

Imo Industries, Inc.

The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne M. Lancaster

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

David M. Stein

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

David M. Stein

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Other Attorneys

David Ryan Cannella

Attorney at Baron & Budd

909 Poydras Street, Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Benjamin David Rumph

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Christopher C. Colley

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (Baton Rouge)

2600 Citiplace Drive, Suite 400

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Kristopher Lynn Thompson

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

47 #14

*Restricted*

47 #12

*Restricted*

47 #4

Exhibit E

47 #2

Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts

43 #21

Exhibit T

43 #20

Exhibit S

43 #11

Exhibit J

43 #6

Exhibit F

43 #1

Exhibit A

4 #14

Summons

4 #9

Summons

4 #3

Summons

#3

(#42) ANSWER to #3 Third Party Complaint,and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:crd).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (pp). (Entered: 04/29/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE: Because R. Docs. #43 and #47 contain more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of each submission in separate binders as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/4/2022. (pp) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Rule 56 Motion Regarding Avondale Shipyard's Government Immunity Defenses filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L)(pp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2022: #12 Sealed Exhibit B, #13 Sealed Exhibit C, #14 Sealed Exhibit D) (pp). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER GRANTING #44 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Huntington's Opposition to Plaintiff's #29 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed in the record. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/4/2022. (pp) (Main Document 46 replaced on 5/4/2022 to correct typo) (tsf). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits B, C, and D under seal to its Opposition to Plaintiffs Rule 56 Motion Regarding Avondales Shipyards Government Immunity Defenses, Alternative Request for Rule 56(d) relief by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2022: #3 Proposed Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Sealed Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Sealed Exhibit D) (pp). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to its Memorandum in Opposition to the Plaintiffs Rule 56 Motion Regarding Avondales Shipyards Government Immunity Defenses, Alternative Request Rule 56(d) Relief by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Statement, #4 Statement, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G - PART 1, #8 Exhibit G - PART 2, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/4/2022 (pp). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ANSWER to #3 Third Party Complaint,and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:crd).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (pp). (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that Metropolitan Life Insurance Company is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, in the above captioned matter with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/28/2022. (pp) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, and Plaintiff, Felton Adam Robichaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 4/28/2022 (pp). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified link/text on 3/16/2022 (pp). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wassau, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Trust, Maryland Casualty Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Viacom CBS, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(pp) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re #1 Notice of Removal.(pp) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wassau, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., Viacom CBS, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against International Paper Company, Imo Industries, Inc., The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wassau, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., Viacom CBS, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket(Filing fee $ 402 receipt number LAE071909) (aj) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-768 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIACOM CBS INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where Employers Insurance Company of Wausau is a litigant

Latest cases where Maryland Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant