This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:16:37 (UTC).

Robertson v. REP Processing, LLC. d/b/a Rimrock Energy Partners

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Robertson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against REP Processing, LLC d/b/a Rimrock Energy Partners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02910

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachariah Robertson

Defendants

REP Processing, LLC. d/b/a Rimrock Energy Partners

REP Processing, LLC.

REP Processing, LLC. doing business as Rimrock Energy Partners

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

REP Processing, LLC.

3Rd Party Defendant

Kestrel Field Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Andrew Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William R. Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

James Michael Cleary, Jr.

Attorney at Martin Disiere Jefferson & Wisdom LLP-Houston

808 Travis Street, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Gregory Scott Fiddler

Attorney at Fiddler & Associates P.C.

1004 Congress, 3Rd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Preliminary Record

12 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#12

(#12) Third Party SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS REQUEST as to KESTREL FIELD SERVICES, INC. re #10 Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Plaintiff REP Processing, LLC.. (Cleary, James) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#10

(#10) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc., filed by REP Processing, LLC..(Cleary, James) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachariah Robertson. REP Processing, LLC. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/6/2019. Third-Party Defendant Kestrel Field Services, Inc. may appear for the 12/10/2019 Scheduling Conference telephonically and shall contact chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Kestrel Field Services, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/5/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by ThirdParty Defendant Kestrel Field Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(Fiddler, Gregory) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zachariah Robertson. (Liles, William) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Third Party SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS REQUEST as to KESTREL FIELD SERVICES, INC. re #10 Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Plaintiff REP Processing, LLC.. (Cleary, James) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc., filed by REP Processing, LLC..(Cleary, James) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney James Michael Cleary, Jr added to party REP Processing, LLC.(pty:dft) by REP Processing, LLC..(Cleary, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachariah Robertson. REP Processing, LLC. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/16/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against REP Processing, LLC. d/b/a Rimrock Energy Partners (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6942283)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla), filed by Zachariah Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REP Processing, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kestrel Field Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Scott Fiddler