This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2020 at 07:10:27 (UTC).

Robertson v. Keyser

Case Summary

On 09/13/2020 Robertson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Keyser. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04318

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Erick Robertson

Fallsburg, NY 12733

Respondent

William F. Keyser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

QUEENS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC

NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC

Attorney at New York State Attorney Generals Office

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653153202 (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter dated October 14, 2020 from Erick Robertson to Clerk of Court, enclosing the $5.00 filing fee and advising that an application for IFP was never received. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER. Petitioner has not paid the filing fee or returned the completed IFP application. However, in light of Petitioner's pro se status and the ongoing health crisis, the Court grants Petitioner an additional thirty days to comply with the filing requirements. The Clerk of Court shall include a request to proceed in forma pauperis with this Order. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Order within thirty days, the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner at the address of record. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2020. (Valentin, Winnethka) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Petitioner's #5 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed by pro se Erick Robertson. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Erick Robertson. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Amend Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed by pro se Erick Robertson, dated 9/25/2020. W/Declaration in Support. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Erick Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653153202 (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter dated October 14, 2020 from Erick Robertson to Clerk of Court, enclosing the $5.00 filing fee and advising that an application for IFP was never received. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. Petitioner has not paid the filing fee or returned the completed IFP application. However, in light of Petitioner's pro se status and the ongoing health crisis, the Court grants Petitioner an additional thirty days to comply with the filing requirements. The Clerk of Court shall include a request to proceed in forma pauperis with this Order. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Order within thirty days, the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner at the address of record. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2020. (Valentin, Winnethka) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Petitioner's #5 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed by pro se Erick Robertson. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Erick Robertson. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Amend Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed by pro se Erick Robertson, dated 9/25/2020. W/Declaration in Support. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Erick Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less