This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 08:10:14 (UTC).

Robertson v. Kestrel Field Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Robertson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kestrel Field Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02409

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachariah Robertson

Defendant

Kestrel Field Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Michael Andrew Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William R. Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Scott Fiddler

Attorney at Fiddler & Associates P.C.

1004 Congress, 3Rd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/9/19. (jdyne, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Zachariah Robertson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Liles, William) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fiddler, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#11

(#11) Defendant Kestrel Field Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint Attorney Gregory Scott Fiddler added to party Kestrel Field Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by Kestrel Field Services, Inc..(Fiddler, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachariah Robertson. Kestrel Field Services, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Liles, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Andrew Josephson on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/26/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6861846), filed by Zachariah Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6860707)Attorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla), filed by Zachariah Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dunlap, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2019 to show filed in error - correct one filed at ECF #2 (angar, ). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/9/19. (jdyne, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Zachariah Robertson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Liles, William) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fiddler, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant Kestrel Field Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint Attorney Gregory Scott Fiddler added to party Kestrel Field Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by Kestrel Field Services, Inc..(Fiddler, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#10) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), ANDREW WELLS DUNLAP was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachariah Robertson. Kestrel Field Services, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Liles, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Andrew Josephson on behalf of Zachariah RobertsonAttorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla) (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/26/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#3) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6861846), filed by Zachariah Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against Kestrel Field Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6860707)Attorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Zachariah Robertson(pty:pla), filed by Zachariah Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dunlap, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2019 to show filed in error - correct one filed at ECF #2 (angar, ). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kestrel Field Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. Liles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Josephson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W. Dunlap