This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:40:57 (UTC).

Robertson v. Berns et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Robertson filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Berns. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Clay Robertson

Marietta, OK 73448

Defendants

United States of America

Martina Kaye Berns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Cooper

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit A Certification

#9

(#9) MOTION to Substitute Party United States of America As Party Defendant by United States of America (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Michael J. Cooper added to party United States of America(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 4/22/2019(Cooper, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on William Barr, U.S. Attorney General (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on Brian J. Kuester, U.S. Attorney (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Martina Kaye Berns - Served on 3/18/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America - U.S. Attorney General (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Martina Kaye Berns (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#3

(#3) LETTER to Plaintiff with Summons forms(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Martina Kaye Berns, United States of America by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder directing Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days as to why Defendant Martina Kaye Berns should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Substitute Party United States of America As Party Defendant by United States of America (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Michael J. Cooper added to party United States of America(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 4/22/2019(Cooper, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on William Barr, U.S. Attorney General (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on Brian J. Kuester, U.S. Attorney (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Martina Kaye Berns - Served on 3/18/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America - U.S. Attorney General (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Martina Kaye Berns (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER to Plaintiff with Summons forms(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/1/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 16427 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Martina Kaye Berns, United States of America by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.