This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 10:00:18 (UTC).

Roberts v. Payne et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Roberts filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Roberts

Marianna, AR 72360

Defendants

Dexter Payne

William F Straughn

Gaylon Lay

A Jackson

A Emsweller

Randle

E Branch

J Andrews

Wendy Kelley

J Dycus

Greg Rechcigl

Gary Kurstien

Rory L Griffin

E Graham

T Allison

M Etherly

C Moore

G Bolden

R Barden

34 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal be granted, the complaint be dismissed without prejudice and this case be closed #3 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/7/2021. (lej) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Roberts. (kdr) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff an IFP Application and a Calculation Sheet. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $402 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/26/2021. (lej) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Roberts.(kdr) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDLE is a litigant