This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2020 at 13:36:45 (UTC).

Roberts v. Monat Global Corp.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Roberts filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monat Global Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-21417

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindi Roberts

Defendant

Monat Global Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loren G. Klitsas

Attorney at Celedonia & Klitsas, PC

550 Westcott, Suite 570

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expy Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index and Certified Copies of Comal County Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental

#2

#3

#5

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#7

7 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#10) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Texas. Case Number 5:20-cv-00292 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:20-cv-21417-DPG on 4/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:18-md-02841-DPG. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS Order administratively closing case in light of the inclusion of this matter in MDL Case No. 18-md-02841-GAYLES. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from Texas Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-00292. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Order issued by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING this cause to the Southern District of Florida to proceed under MDL No. 2841. (rg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Monat Global Corp. answer due 4/14/2020. (mgr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Answer deadline is extended to on or before April 14, 2020. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ar) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Potential Tag-Alone Action from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Loren G. Klitsas regarding Attorney Admission to the WD/TX. (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monat Global Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13322011), filed by Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index and Certified Copies of Comal County Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monat Global Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Dorman Matthews