This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:54:16 (UTC).

Roberts v. Monat Global Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Roberts filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monat Global Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ezra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindi Roberts

Defendant

Monat Global Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loren G. Klitsas

Attorney at Celedonia & Klitsas, PC

550 Westcott, Suite 570

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expy, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index and Certified Copies of Comal County Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental

#2

#3

#5

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District District, Florida Division as case number 1:20cv21417. (mgr) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in SDFL District, Miami Division as case number MDL No.2841. (rg) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Order issued by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING this cause to the Southern District of Florida to proceed under MDL No. 2841. (rg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Monat Global Corp. answer due 4/14/2020. (mgr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Answer deadline is extended to on or before April 14, 2020. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ar) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Potential Tag-Alone Action from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Loren G. Klitsas regarding Attorney Admission to the WD/TX. (mgr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monat Global Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13322011), filed by Monat Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index and Certified Copies of Comal County Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(Matthews, Melissa) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monat Global Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loren G Klitsas