This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2019 at 07:18:57 (UTC).

Roberts v. Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Roberts filed an Other lawsuit against Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11722

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Roberts

Defendants

Champion Funding Inc.

7 May Avenue

Avon, MA 02322

Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited

185 Main Street, Suite 34

Avon, MA 02322

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin V.K. Crick

Attorney at Rights Protection Law Group, PLLC

8 Faneuil Hall Marketplace, Third Floor

Boston, MA 02109

James L. Davidson

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC

7601 N Federal Hwy Ste 230A

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Champion Funding Inc..(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Roberts, Champion Funding Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7823842 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James L. Davidson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872009 by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Davidson)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Roberts. (Davidson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Champion Funding Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

10 #1

Affidavit Declaration of James L. Davidson

#12

(#12) MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint by Mark Roberts.(Davidson, James) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Davidson on behalf of Mark Roberts (Davidson, James) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Champion Funding Inc., Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter

1 #3

Category Form

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Roberts. (Davidson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Davidson on behalf of Mark Roberts (Davidson, James) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint by Mark Roberts.(Davidson, James) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added James L. Davidson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James L. Davidson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872009 by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Davidson)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Champion Funding Inc..(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Champion Funding Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Champion Funding Inc., Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • (#3) FILED in ERROR Modified on 8/9/2019 (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Roberts, Champion Funding Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7823842 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.