This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 10:06:49 (UTC).

Helb v. Hoover et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Helb filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Hoover. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01008

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abel Helb

Mcelhattan, PA 17748

Petitioner

Ajarhi Roberts

Respondents and Defendants

Lt. Powell

Reynolds

Simona Flores

Joseph Dunn

L. Francis Cissna

Lt. Probst

Deputy Superintendent Kormanic

Angela Hoover

Jennifer Moon

William Barr

Lt. Gates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph J Terz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut St, Room 217, Federal Building

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joanne M. Sanderson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

#3

3 #1

Notice of Consent

3 #2

NEW PRISONER PACK ATTACHED

#4

4 #1

IFP (civil rights)

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Release or Bail filed by Abel Helb.(mfa) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Abel Helb - IT IS RECOMMENDED that this complaint be dismissed without prejudice to renewal if the plaintiff complies with this courts order. Objections to R&R due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 30, 2020. (kjn) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #6 Letter - The plaintiffs request to consolidate, is DENIED and the plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with the scheduling orders previously entered by this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 7, 2020. (kjn) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Abel Helb re: combining cases and filing fee. (pjr) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re: pre-trial management. 1. On or before July 24, 2020, each individual plaintiff must pay the filing fee prescribed by law, or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. 2. In addition, on or before July 24, 2020 each individual plaintiff must submit a complaint to the court describing that plaintiffs claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 23, 2020. (mfa) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 06/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 NEW PRISONER PACK ATTACHED) (lp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carlson. (jw) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Joseph Dunn, Simona Flores, Lt. Gates, Angela Hoover, Deputy Superintendent Kormanic, Jennifer Moon, Lt. Powell, Lt. Probst, Reynolds lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Abel Helb.(bg) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bg). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application Request for Enlargement of Page Numbers or Words inTRO, filed by Abel Helb.(mfa) Modified on 6/20/2020 (lp). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYNOLDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joanne M. Sanderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz