This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 10:11:08 (UTC).

Roberts v. Gallagher, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Roberts filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Gallagher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08255

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Russell Roberts

Chetek, WI 54728

Defendants

Lee Anne Gallagher

MAPFRE Insurance doing business as Commerce Insurance Company

Volkswagen Group of America Incorporated

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Hertz Global Holdings Incorporated

Enterprise Rental Company

Northern Arizona Healthcare

Enterprise Holdings Incorporated

EAN Holdings LLC

Enterprise Rent A Car

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Pearson Goode

Attorney at Borgelt Powell Peterson & Frauen SC

1243 N 10Th St., Ste. 300

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Geoffrey Gerard Collins

Attorney at Childers Hanlon & Hudson PLC

722 E Osborn Rd., Ste. 100

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Erik Matthew Gustafson

Attorney at Borgelt Powell Peterson & Frauen SC

1243 N 10Th St., Ste. 300

Milwaukee, WI 53205

David T Lundmark

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Lori Ann Zirkle

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke LLP

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Michael J Kanute

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - Wacker Dr. Chicago

311 S Wacker Dr., Ste. 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Tess Maurelia Godhardt

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - Wacker Dr. Chicago

311 S Wacker Dr., Ste. 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Peter M Farb

Attorney at Law Offices of Thomas P Stilp

P.O. Box 245023

Milwaukee, WI 53224-9523

Steven Thomas Elmer

Attorney at Law Offices of John C Syverson

11800 W Park Pl., Ste. 210

Milwaukee, WI 53224

Daniel S Elger

Attorney at Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik SC

1 Park Plz.11270 W Park Pl., Ste. 500

Milwaukee, WI 53224

Jose Antonio Castro

Attorney at Spencer Fane - Denver, CO

1700 Lincoln St., Ste. 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Stacy K Luell

Attorney at Crivello Carlson SC

710 N Plankinton Ave., Ste. 500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Andreas Daniel Coumides

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

Daniel Allen Haws

Attorney at HKM PA

30 E 7Th St., Ste. 3200

St Paul, MN 55101

Kathleen Kimberly Curtis

Attorney at HKM PA

30 E 7Th St., Ste. 3200

St Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

80 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A to C to Motion to Dismiss

#80

(#80) MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims (Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by Volkswagen Group of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to C to Motion to Dismiss)(Zirkle, Lori) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#76

(#76) ORDER that the Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (with Client Consent) (Doc. #75 ) is GRANTED. Attorney Lori A. Zirkle and David T. Lundmark of Bowman and Brooke LLP shall be substituted as Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s counsel of record in this matter in place of Michael J. Kanute and Tess Maurelia Godhardt of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall kindly terminate Michael J. Kanute and Tess Maurelia Godhardt of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP as counsel of record for Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in this matter. Signed by Judge Diane J. Humetewa on 12/17/21. (NKS) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

75 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Couns

#75

(#75) EX PARTE MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (With Client Consent) by Volkswagen Group of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (With Client Consent))(Zirkle, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

74 #1

Proposed Order

#74

(#74) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: A. Daniel Coumides appearing for Enterprise Rental Company. Attorney Stacy K Luell terminated. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coumides, Andreas) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#73

(#73) NOTICE re: of Authority to Consent to Substitution by Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #72 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Defendant MAPFRE's Notice of Authority to Consent to Substitution. (Collins, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#72

(#73) NOTICE re: of Authority to Consent to Substitution by Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #72 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Defendant MAPFRE's Notice of Authority to Consent to Substitution. (Collins, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

2 #7

Summons as to EAN Holdings dba Enterprise Rental Company

2 #3

Summons as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

2 #2

Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance

2 #1

Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance

1 #4

Cover Letter

1 #3

Summonses

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Crash report, vehicle removal report, correspondence

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690036702), filed by William Russell Roberts. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Crash report, vehicle removal report, correspondence, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses, #4 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims (Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by Volkswagen Group of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to C to Motion to Dismiss)(Zirkle, Lori) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Attorney Substitution (Doc. #74 ). IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 83.3(b)(4) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedures, the law firm of Gust Rosenfeld, P.L.C. and A. Daniel Coumides are substituted as attorneys of record for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Enterprise Rental Company, and Enterprise Rent A Car in place of the law firm of Crivello Carlson, S.C. and Stacy K. Luell for all further proceedings. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/4/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Peter M Farb. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 76. (REK) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Peter M Farb. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. Document number 72. (REK) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Daniel S Elger terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Kathleen Kimberly Curtis terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER that the Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (with Client Consent) (Doc. #75 ) is GRANTED. Attorney Lori A. Zirkle and David T. Lundmark of Bowman and Brooke LLP shall be substituted as Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s counsel of record in this matter in place of Michael J. Kanute and Tess Maurelia Godhardt of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall kindly terminate Michael J. Kanute and Tess Maurelia Godhardt of Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP as counsel of record for Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. in this matter. Signed by Judge Diane J. Humetewa on 12/17/21. (NKS) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) EX PARTE MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (With Client Consent) by Volkswagen Group of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Specially Appearing Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (With Client Consent))(Zirkle, Lori) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: A. Daniel Coumides appearing for Enterprise Rental Company. Attorney Stacy K Luell terminated. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coumides, Andreas) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE re: of Authority to Consent to Substitution by Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #72 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Defendant MAPFRE's Notice of Authority to Consent to Substitution. (Collins, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Allen Haws for Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare. (Haws, Daniel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Briefing Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 5/26/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/5/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration of Gregory Kosnoski filed by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gustafson, Erik),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Lee Anne Gallagher filed by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Gustafson, Erik),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance (Gustafson, Erik),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Andrea Pearson Goode for Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance. (Goode, Andrea),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant MAPFRE Insurance. (Gustafson, Erik),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Erik Matthew Gustafson for Defendant MAPFRE Insurance. (Gustafson, Erik),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance, #2 Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance, #3 Summons as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., #4 Summons as to Liberty Mutual Insurance, #5 Summons as to Hertz Corporat Headquarters, #6 Summons as to Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., #7 Summons as to EAN Holdings dba Enterprise Rental Company, #8 Summons as to Enterprise Holdings, #9 Summons as to Northern Arizona Healthcare) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690036702), filed by William Russell Roberts. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Crash report, vehicle removal report, correspondence, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses, #4 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant