This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 09:48:07 (UTC).

Roberts v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Roberts filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01339

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Roberts

Milwaukee, WI 53218

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brian E Pawlak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Social Security Administration

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

600 W Madison St - 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/11/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Roberts) (Griesbach, William)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/24/2020. (cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Briefing Letter transmitted to the parties: Administrative Record due 11/23/2020; Plaintiffs brief due 12/31/2020; Defendants response due 2/9/2021; Plaintiffs reply due 2/24/2021. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to Patricia Roberts) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/17/2020. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Patricia Roberts. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketTransmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/11/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Roberts) (Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Patricia Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Second IFP)(blr) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Patricia Roberts (Social Security Form). (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Standard Form))(blr) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less