This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2021 at 11:17:29 (UTC).

Roberts v. August Bioservices, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Roberts filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against August Bioservices, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Von Hoene Roberts

Defendants

August Bioservices, LLC

PMI Biopharma Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia A. Wilson

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

Kenneth S. Williams

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

Defendant Attorneys

Marcia L. Pearson

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

100 Mallard Creek Road, Suite 250

Louisville, KY 40207

Jamie K. Durrett

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

3102 West End Avenue, Suite 400

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by August Bioservices, LLC. (Pearson, Marcia) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie K. Durrett on behalf of August Bioservices, LLC (Durrett, Jamie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. Pearson on behalf of August Bioservices, LLC (Pearson, Marcia) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on March 22, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Von Hoene Roberts. August Bioservices, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2021. (Wilson, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to August Bioservices, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel.) (kc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Right to Sue Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against August Bioservices, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3296854), filed by Jennifer Von Hoene Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Right to Sue Letter, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by August Bioservices, LLC. (Pearson, Marcia) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketKY and TN State Bar status verified as active for Marcia L. Pearson admitted to this court local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Jamie K. Durrett admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie K. Durrett on behalf of August Bioservices, LLC (Durrett, Jamie) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. Pearson on behalf of August Bioservices, LLC (Pearson, Marcia) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on March 22, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Von Hoene Roberts. August Bioservices, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2021. (Wilson, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to August Bioservices, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel.) (kc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia A. Wilson and Kenneth S. Williams admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against August Bioservices, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3296854), filed by Jennifer Von Hoene Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Right to Sue Letter, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia A. Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth S. Williams