This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:58:40 (UTC).

Roberts v. Alcon Research LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Roberts filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Alcon Research LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00786

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse I Roberts

Defendants

Alcon Research LLC

Alcon Laboratories

Alcon Research, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Fielding

Attorney at David Fielding PC

101 Summit Avenue, Suite 1010

Fort Worth, TX 76102-2617

Defendant Attorneys

Shira R Yoshor

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Angeles Garcia Cassin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1000 Louisiana St., Ste. 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order,, #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration to the Fifth Circuit by Alcon Laboratories. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-12121075. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Yoshor, Shira) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/13/2021) (npk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order,, #5 Notice (Other), Terminated Case and Designation of Local Counsel filed by Alcon Laboratories (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yoshor, Shira) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Remand mailed to 17th District Court, Tarrant County re: #4 Order. (npk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (npk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Defendant Alcon Laboratories removed this case from the 17th District Court of Tarrant County, Texas to this Court on June 25, 2021. ECF No. 1. The same day, Defendant was electronically notified that it must comply with Local Rule 83.10 within fourteen days. ECF No. 2. A review of the record reveals that as of the date of this order, Defendant is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the 17th District Court of Tarrant County, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/12/2021) (npk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alcon Laboratories. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Yoshor, Shira) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Alcon Laboratories . (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12005098) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Yoshor, Shira) Modified on 6/28/2021 (npk). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcon Research, LLC is a litigant