This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:07:39 (UTC).

Roberta Cervantes v. Southern California Permanente Medical Group et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Roberta Cervantes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Southern California Permanente Medical Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberta Cervantes

Defendants

Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Does 1-20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob C Husen

Attorney at Law Offices of Brad Husen

2200 Vesper Circle Suite F7

Corona, CA 92879

Brad J Husen

Attorney at Law Offices of Brad Husen

2200 Vesper Circle Suite F-7

Corona, CA 92879-3519

Defendant Attorney

Shauna Lee Michelle Sinnott

Attorney at Lagasse Branch Bell and Kinkead LLP

4365 Executive Drive Suite 950

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CALIFORNIA, case number RIC1903430 Receipt No: ACACDC-32612165 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERTA CERVANTES. (Attorney Jacob C Husen added to party ROBERTA CERVANTES(pty:pla))(Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERTA CERVANTES, (Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ROBERTA CERVANTES. (Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00078-CJC (KKx). (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER SUA SPONTE REMANDING CASE TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case number RIC1903430. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (twdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#8

(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. (twdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. (twdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SUA SPONTE REMANDING CASE TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case number RIC1903430. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (twdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00078-CJC (KKx). (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Southern California Permanente Medical Group,Does 1-20, Inclusive amending Amended Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Roberta Cervantes. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/4/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Does 1-20, Inclusive amending Amended Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Roberta Cervantes. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/3/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Does 1-20, Inclusive. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Roberta Cervantes. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Does 1-20, Inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Roberta Cervantes. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ROBERTA CERVANTES. (Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERTA CERVANTES, (Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CALIFORNIA, case number RIC1903430 Receipt No: ACACDC-32612165 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERTA CERVANTES. (Attorney Jacob C Husen added to party ROBERTA CERVANTES(pty:pla))(Husen, Jacob) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant