This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 12:41:37 (UTC).

Robert Gomes v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Robert Gomes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06051

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Gomes

Defendants

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Does 1 through 100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ivan P Medina

James Alexander De Sario

Michael Nourmand

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell A Wrosch

Alis Marie Moon

Paloma P Peracchio

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc... (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER TO CONTINUE THE NOVEMBER 4, 2022 HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION ANDPARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND PARTIAL MOTION TO STAY, #19 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The hearing date on Defendants Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, and Partial Motion to Stay to file a Motion for Class Certification is continuedto January 6, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., in Department 7B, of the above-entitled Courthouse. Plaintiffs opposition papers shall be filed on or before December 16, 2022 and Defendants reply papers shall be filed on or before December 23, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to this same date and time. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from November 4, 2022 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action and to Stay #17 filed by Plaintiff Robert Gomes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De Sario, James) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Declaration

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action and to Stay filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#15

(#15) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Related Case(s):. 2:17-cv-07641-AB-KK; 5:21-cv-00294-AB-KK; 2:20-cv-07045-AB-KK; 5:21-cv-00166-FLA-KK (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Laura Kish re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint, Pleadings & Orders

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc... (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER TO CONTINUE THE NOVEMBER 4, 2022 HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION ANDPARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, AND PARTIAL MOTION TO STAY, #19 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The hearing date on Defendants Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, and Partial Motion to Stay to file a Motion for Class Certification is continuedto January 6, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., in Department 7B, of the above-entitled Courthouse. Plaintiffs opposition papers shall be filed on or before December 16, 2022 and Defendants reply papers shall be filed on or before December 23, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to this same date and time. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from November 4, 2022 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action and to Stay #17 filed by Plaintiff Robert Gomes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De Sario, James) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action and to Stay filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022

Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for October 6, 2022, is vacated. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-00294 AB(KKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-06051 AB(KKx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for October 6, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than September 28, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (rolm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Robert Gomes in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/8/2022, attached to Wrosch Decl as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Related Case(s):. 2:17-cv-07641-AB-KK; 5:21-cv-00294-AB-KK; 2:20-cv-07045-AB-KK; 5:21-cv-00166-FLA-KK (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Laura Kish re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Mitchell A. Wrosch re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV22177 Receipt No: ACACDC-33877260 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Pleadings & Orders) (Attorney Mitchell A Wrosch added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wrosch, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less