This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 09:34:07 (UTC).

Robert Carson et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Robert Carson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03447

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hong Carson

Robert Carson

Defendants

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Does 1 to 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance D Orloff

Attorney at Grant Genovese and Baratta

Wells Fargo Bank Building, 2030 Main Street Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

Alan J Carnegie

Attorney at Alan Carnegie Law Offices APC

23945 Calabasas Road Suite 116

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Blake J Russum

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

1001 Marshall Street 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063-2052

Birgit A Huber Willand

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

445 South Figueroa Street Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Lance D. Orloff on behalf of Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson. Filed by Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson (Attorney Lance D Orloff added to party Hong Carson(pty:pla), Attorney Lance D Orloff added to party Robert Carson(pty:pla))(Orloff, Lance) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#18

(#18) REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#17

(#17) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson. (Carnegie, Alan) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #12 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Defendant Safeco Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss is continued from June 14, 2021 to June 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8A. Deadlines for filing opposing and reply papers are tied to the new hearing date. (lom) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests--->Motion--->Dismiss Case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#10

(#11) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. as to Request for Judicial Notice #10 . (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. Re: Notice (Other) #8 (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests--->Motion--->Dismiss Case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois answer now due 5/13/2021, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Huber Willand, Birgit) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, identifying Robert Carson, Hong Carson, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Liberty Mutual Holding Company, LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Safeco Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Lance D. Orloff on behalf of Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson. Filed by Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson (Attorney Lance D Orloff added to party Hong Carson(pty:pla), Attorney Lance D Orloff added to party Robert Carson(pty:pla))(Orloff, Lance) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiffs Hong Carson, Robert Carson. (Carnegie, Alan) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #12 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Defendant Safeco Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss is continued from June 14, 2021 to June 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8A. Deadlines for filing opposing and reply papers are tied to the new hearing date. (lom) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY NOTICE RE: Stipulation to Continue Hearing #12 . The Stipulation filed on 05/14/21 #12 fails to comply with the Central District of California's Local Rules. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel shall email the Stipulation in PDF format, and the proposed order in Microsoft Word to the Judge's generic chambers email, no later than 4:00 pm of 05/20/2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests--->Motion--->Dismiss Case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from June 14, 2021 to June 28, 2021 filed by Plaintiff Hong Carson, Robert Carson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing)(Carnegie, Alan) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. as to Request for Judicial Notice #10 . (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. Re: Notice (Other) #8 (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Russum, Blake) Modified on 5/20/2021 (cch). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois answer now due 5/13/2021, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Huber Willand, Birgit) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Robert Carson, Hong Carson. (filed in state court 3/23/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, identifying Robert Carson, Hong Carson, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Liberty Mutual Holding Company, LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Safeco Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV1176 Receipt No: ACACDC-31165729 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Petition, #2 Declaration of Michael Garvey in Support of Petition for Removal) (Attorney Blake J Russum added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois(pty:dft))(Russum, Blake) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blake J Russum