This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 08:04:53 (UTC).

Roberson v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Roberson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ouachita Correctional Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11585

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent D. Roberson

Monroe, LA 71202

Defendants

Doctor Parker

Ouachita Correctional Center

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reconsider Pauper Status by Vincent D. Roberson. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER that Clerk of Court terminate the deficiency assigned to the pauper application Rec. Doc. No. #2 , for purposes of entering this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs application is DENIED because plaintiff has not submitted a certified copy of the trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/14/2019. (caa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/1/2019. (sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#2

(#2) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vincent D. Roberson. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Ouachita Correctional Center, Doctor Parker filed by Vincent D. Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reconsider Pauper Status by Vincent D. Roberson. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that Clerk of Court terminate the deficiency assigned to the pauper application Rec. Doc. No. #2 , for purposes of entering this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs application is DENIED because plaintiff has not submitted a certified copy of the trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/14/2019. (caa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/1/2019. (sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vincent D. Roberson. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Ouachita Correctional Center, Doctor Parker filed by Vincent D. Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ouachita Correctional Center is a litigant