Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:50:41 (UTC).

Roberson v. Collier-TDCJ Executive Director et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Roberson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Collier-TDCJ Executive Director. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00262

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Yvette Roberson

Marlin, TX 76661

Defendants

Warden Donna Kazmierczak

Asst. Warden Karen Stroleny

Robert N. Dunn

FNU Kopp

Daniel C. DeLeon

Brian Collier-TDCJ Executive Director

Asst. Warden Cecil Sellers

Krystal G. Long

Director Lorie Davis

Starlisa Roberts

Sandy L. Tackett

A. Trevino

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Summons Issued as to Lorie Davis; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to Brian Collier-TDCJ Executive Director; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#18

(#18) Summons Issued as to Donna Kazmierczak; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to Cecil Sellers; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#16

(#16) Summons Issued as to Karen Stroleny; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#15

(#15) Summons Issued as to Sandy L. Tackett; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#14

(#14) Summons Issued as to A. Trevino; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Krystal G. Long; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Daniel C. DeLeon; ; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Case Opening Letter. (Attachments: #1 Privacy Policy)(lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#7) ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Complaint by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Complaint by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

6 #2

Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19

6 #1

Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19, #2 Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Summons Issued as to Lorie Davis; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Summons Issued as to Brian Collier-TDCJ Executive Director; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to Donna Kazmierczak; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Cecil Sellers; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Karen Stroleny; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to Sandy L. Tackett; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to A. Trevino; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Krystal G. Long; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Daniel C. DeLeon; ; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to FNU Kopp; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Starlisa Roberts; served via e-mail pursuant to Order dated 5/15/20. (am) Modified on 5/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Robert N. Dunn; served via e-mail per Order dated 5/15/2020. (am) Modified on 5/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of CRYSTAL YVETTE ROBERSON #1915067 isassessed an initial partial filing fee of $18.65. Thereafter,the plaintiff shall pay $331.35, the balance of the filing fees, in periodicinstallments. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk prepare and issue summons directed to Defendants electronically. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Opening Letter. (Attachments: #1 Privacy Policy)(lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Complaint by Crystal Yvette Roberson. (lad) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Crystal Yvette Roberson.(lad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lad). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19, #2 Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less