This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:50:13 (UTC).

Roberson Motors, Inc. et al v. Schumacher Electric Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Roberson Motors, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Schumacher Electric Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01050

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sentry Select Insurance Company

Roberson Motors, Inc.

Defendants

Amazon.com Services Inc.

Schumacher Electric Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul C. Galm

Attorney at Davis Galm Law Firm

12220 Sw First Street

Beaverton, OR 97005

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy M. Margolis

Attorney at Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP

900 Sw Fifth Avenue, 24Th Floor

Portland, OR 97204

Nicholas E. Wheeler

Attorney at Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP

900 Sw Fifth Avenue, 24Th Floor

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Wheeler, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#11

(#11) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Wheeler, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Galm, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Roberson Motors, Inc.. (Galm, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration of Wendy M. Margolis in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/31/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/2/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #3

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV24199 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5913378 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc., Schumacher Electric Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet). (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 10/15/2019 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel be separate sealed entry. (peg) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Wheeler, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Wheeler, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Galm, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Roberson Motors, Inc.. (Galm, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendants' unopposed motion #4 for extension of time to 8/9/19, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Defendant is to note that the corporate disclosure statement is due no later than 7/17/19. (peg) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration of Wendy M. Margolis in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/31/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/2/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV24199 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5913378 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc., Schumacher Electric Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet). (Margolis, Wendy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.