This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:12:43 (UTC).

Anthony Robello v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Anthony Robello filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01269

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Robello

Defendant

BNSF Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher N Coby Cohen

Attorney at Rossi Vucinovich PC

1000 - 2Nd Avenue Suiote 1780

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie L Quinn

Attorney at Murphy Campbell Alliston and Quinn

8801 Folsom Blvd Suite 230

Sacramento, CA 95826

Mariel Covarrubias

Attorney at Murphy Campbell Alliston and Quinn

8801 Folsom Boulevard

Sacramento, CA 95826

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24060949 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Attorney Christopher N Coby Cohen added to party Anthony Robello(pty:pla))(Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

12 #1

Declaration Electronic Service

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Attorney Mariel Covarrubias added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Covarrubias, Mariel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

13 #1

Declaration Electronic Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello, (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant BNSF Railway Company. (twdb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Process Server for Anthony Robello, upon Defendant BNSF Railway Company served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BNSF Railway Co. c/o CT Corporation System - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Covarrubias, Mariel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Covarrubias, Mariel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Attorney Mariel Covarrubias added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Covarrubias, Mariel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Process Server for Anthony Robello, upon Defendant BNSF Railway Company served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BNSF Railway Co. c/o CT Corporation System - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant BNSF Railway Company. (twdb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello, (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24060949 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Attorney Christopher N Coby Cohen added to party Anthony Robello(pty:pla))(Cohen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less