This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:24:06 (UTC).

Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation v. Diaz-Cueto et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Robb Evans Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Diaz-Cueto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles B. Day and Peter J. Messitte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02049

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles B. Day

Peter J. Messitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation

Defendants

Jorge Diaz-Cueto

Bella Mar Estates, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E Van Horn

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

1717 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Gary Owen Caris

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Ste. 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Summons Jorge Diaz-Cueto

1 #9

Summons Bella Mar Estates, Ltd.

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation. All Defendants.(Van Horn, James) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation. Jorge Diaz-Cueto served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021.(Van Horn, James) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation. Bella Mar Estates, Ltd. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021.(Van Horn, James) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gary Owen Caris. Directing attorney Gary Owen Caris to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary Owen Caris (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9445410.) by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation(Van Horn, James) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Bella Mar Estates, Ltd., Jorge Diaz-Cueto.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation (Van Horn, James) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bella Mar Estates, Ltd., Jorge Diaz-Cueto ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9433404.), filed by Robb Evans & Associates, LLC, as Court Appointed Receiver in the In re Sanctuary Belize Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Bella Mar Estates, Ltd., #10 Summons Jorge Diaz-Cueto)(Van Horn, James) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robb Evans & Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary O Caris