This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2020 at 10:08:16 (UTC).

Roark v. Menzies Aviation

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Roark filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Menzies Aviation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Roark

Defendant

Menzies Aviation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason D. Haymore

Attorney at PEARSON BUTLER & CARSON PLLC

1802 W South Jordan Pkwy Ste 200

South Jordan, UT 84095

Dawn W. Emery

Attorney at PEARSON BUTLER PLLC

1802 W South Jordan Pkwy Ste 200

South Jordan, UT 84095

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher G. Ward

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

321 N Clark St Ste 3000

Chicago, IL 60654-4762

Patrick Joseph McMahon

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

321 N Clark St Ste 3000

Chicago, IL 60654-4762

Michael P. O'Brien

Attorney at JONES WALDO HOLBROOK & MCDONOUGH

170 S Main St Ste 1500

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order

15 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission

7 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2021. Motions due by 10/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/29/20. (alf) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Joseph McMahon for Menzies Aviation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/29/20. (alf) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Joseph McMahon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3734917,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Menzies Aviation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Emery, Dawn) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Menzies Aviation, Plaintiff Lynn Roark. (alf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#12) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Lynn Roark. (alf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#11) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Menzies Aviation. (alf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Menzies Aviation.(O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher G. Ward for Menzies Aviation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/27/20. (alf) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Menzies Aviation, Plaintiff Lynn Roark. Form due by 9/11/2020. (alf) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G. Ward , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3697224,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Menzies Aviation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. O'Brien on behalf of Menzies Aviation (O'Brien, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Roark as to Menzies Aviation served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Haymore, Jason) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/5/20. (alf) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Menzies Aviation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3671417) filed by Lynn Roark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Emery, Dawn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Lynn Roark is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D. Haymore