This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:05:17 (UTC).

Roach v. Bush Ross, P.A.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Roach filed an Other lawsuit against Bush Ross, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas G. Wilson and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyle Roach

Defendant

Bush Ross, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jesse S. Johnson

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil, PLLC

7601 N. Federal Hwy., Suite A-230

Boca Raton, FL 33487

James L. Davidson

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil, PLLC

7601 N. Federal Hwy., Suite A-230

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

Vincent Falcone, III

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, P.A.

P.O. Box 1631

Orlando, FL 32802-1631

Robyn Michelle Kramer

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA

P.O. Box 1631

Orlando, FL 32802-1631

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Bush Ross, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Falcone, Vincent) Modified on 9/3/2020 (TDC). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Michelle Kramer on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Kramer, Robyn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bush Ross, P.A.. Related case(s): no (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Bush Ross, P.A.. (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Falcone, III on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kyle Roach. Related case(s): No (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kyle Roach. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 07/22/2020 by Kyle Roach as to Bush Ross, P.A.. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Bush Ross, P.A. (CRH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - October 23, 2019 Letter

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Bush Ross, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Falcone, Vincent) Modified on 9/3/2020 (TDC). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Responding to Class Action Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including September 2, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2020. (MWC) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Michelle Kramer on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Kramer, Robyn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bush Ross, P.A.. Related case(s): no (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Bush Ross, P.A.. (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bush Ross, P.A.. (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Falcone, III on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Falcone, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kyle Roach. Related case(s): No (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kyle Roach. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 07/22/2020 by Kyle Roach as to Bush Ross, P.A.. (Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Bush Ross, P.A. (CRH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-1651-T-35TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bush Ross, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17072815) filed by Kyle Roach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 23, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Johnson, Jesse) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less