This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 10:11:18 (UTC).

R.M. et al v. SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 R M filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00103

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIVIO MAGNOTTA

DAWN MAGNOTTA

R.M.

Defendants

SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

JOHN DOE(S) 1-10

SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE

XYZ CO(S) 2-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK S. HARRISON

Attorney at HARRISON & CHRISTOS, ESQS.

1217 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, NJ 08701

Defendant Attorney

HEATHER M. EICHENBAUM

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON & ROSEN, PC

1635 Market Street, 7Thfloor, Seven Penn Center

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Fact Discovery shall be completed by 9/1/2021; Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be filed no later than 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/8/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit C by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/5/2021. (jdb, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE.(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-2496-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11923062), filed by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Fact Discovery shall be completed by 9/1/2021; Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be filed no later than 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/8/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/8/2021. (mm) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit C by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (abr, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/5/2021. (jdb, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE.(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heather Eichenbaum on 1/5/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Corporate Disclosure Statement USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Corporate Disclosure Statement. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Disclosure Statement by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-2496-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11923062), filed by SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION is a litigant