This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 14:57:20 (UTC).

RM AUCTIONS, INC. et al v. AHN et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 RM AUCTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AHN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda V. Parker and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12989

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RM AUCTIONS, INC.

RM CLASSIC CARS, INC.

Defendants

KENNETH AHN

BROAD ARROW PRIVATE SALES, LLC d/b/a COLLECTORS GARAGE

Alain Squindo

Ian Kelleher

Michael Mortorano

Ruprecht Andrew (Barney)

Alexander Weaver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley R. Fickel

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

333 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark J. Magyar

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

201 Townsend Street, Suite 900

Lansing, MI 48933

Defendant Attorneys

A. Michael Palizzi

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

Conor T. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

150 W Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

28 #2

Exhibit 1 (Madsen Declaration with Exhibits A and B)

28 #1

Index of Exhibits Index

25 #12

Exhibit K: Hagerty Events, LLC v. RM Auctions Inc. d/a/a RM Sothebys Verified Co

25 #11

Exhibit J: February 25, 2022 Letter from Broad Arrow Employees Counsel to RM Cou

25 #9

Exhibit H: RM Auctions, Inc. New York Workers Compensation Portal Information

25 #8

Exhibit G: RM Auctions, Inc. 2015 Florida filing

25 #7

Exhibit F: RM Auctions, Inc. 2000 Florida filing

25 #6

Exhibit E: WANE.COM January 25, 2022 article

25 #3

Exhibit B: 2021 RM Auctions, Inc. Indiana Foreign Business Registration

4 #1

Exhibit A (signed return receipt)

#3

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (signed return receipt)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *KENNETH AHN* (TTho) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (signed return receipt)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and to Stay Amended Complaint in Favor of Arbitration filed by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit 1 (Madsen Declaration with Exhibits A and B)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING REMAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and to Stay Amended Complaint in Favor of Arbitration :( Response due by 7/7/2022, Reply due by 7/28/2022). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC. re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #22 Response to Motion (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and to Stay Amended Complaint in Favor of Arbitration by Ruprecht Andrew (Barney), Ian Kelleher, Michael Mortorano, Alain Squindo, Alexander Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Alain Squindo Declaration, #3 Exhibit B: 2021 RM Auctions, Inc. Indiana Foreign Business Registration, #4 Exhibit C: RM Auctions, Inc. Indiana Property Warranty Deed, #5 Exhibit D: Fort Wayne Business Weekly January 25, 2022 article, #6 Exhibit E: WANE.COM January 25, 2022 article, #7 Exhibit F: RM Auctions, Inc. 2000 Florida filing, #8 Exhibit G: RM Auctions, Inc. 2015 Florida filing, #9 Exhibit H: RM Auctions, Inc. New York Workers Compensation Portal Information, #10 Exhibit I: AAA Commercial Arbitration Rule R-7(a), #11 Exhibit J: February 25, 2022 Letter from Broad Arrow Employees Counsel to RM Counsel, #12 Exhibit K: Hagerty Events, LLC v. RM Auctions Inc. d/a/a RM Sothebys Verified Complaint filed May 16, 2022 in the Delaware Court of Chancery) (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR BRIEFING ON BROAD ARROW EMPLOYEES' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint - Corrected - In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by KENNETH AHN. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of A. Michael Palizzi) (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Opposing Plaintiff's Motion filed by KENNETH AHN. (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) [DOCUMENT IS TITLED REPLY BRIEF]RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by KENNETH AHN. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of A. Michael Palizzi) (Palizzi, A.) Modified on 5/13/2022 (DAll). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits 1 to 3, #2 Exhibit 1 (Magyar Declaration with Exhibits A through C), #3 Exhibit 2 (Proposed SAC, redline), #4 Exhibit 3 (Proposed SAC, clean)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits 1 Through 8, #2 Exhibit 1 (Magyar Declaration with Exhibits A through C), #3 Exhibit 2 (Delaware Emergency Motion 3.7.22), #4 Exhibit 3 (Delaware Order 3.8.22), #5 Exhibit 4 (Delaware Transcript, 3.11.22), #6 Exhibit 5 (Delaware Order, 3.11.22), #7 Exhibit 6 (Delaware Order, 3.17.22(, #8 Exhibit 7 (RM Motion to Dismiss Delaware case, 3.25.22), #9 Exhibit 8 (Delaware Order, 4.7.22)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC. against KENNETH AHN, Alain Squindo, Ian Kelleher, Michael Mortorano, Ruprecht Andrew (Barney), Alexander Weaver. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits 1 through 13 to FAC, #2 Exhibit 1 (Ahn Employment Agreement), #3 Exhibit 2 (Ruprecht Employment Agreement), #4 Exhibit 3 (Weaver Employment Agreement), #5 Exhibit 4 (Squindo Employment Agreement), #6 Exhibit 5 (Kelleher Employment Agreement), #7 Exhibit 6 (Mortorano Employment Agreement), #8 Exhibit 7 (Ahn Amendment Agreement), #9 Exhibit 8 (Ahn Second Amendment Agreement), #10 Exhibit 9 (Mortorano Separation Agreement), #11 Exhibit 10 (Broad Arrow Press Release, 12.6.21), #12 Exhibit 11 (Broad Arrow Press Release, 12.13.21), #13 Exhibit 12 (Yahoo News Article, 12.13.21), #14 Exhibit 13 (Wayne County Business Court Complaint against BAG, Broad Arrow)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, ( Response due by 3/4/2022). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by A. Michael Palizzi on behalf of All Defendants. (Palizzi, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Conor T. Fitzpatrick on behalf of All Defendants. (Fitzpatrick, Conor) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by RM AUCTIONS, INC., RM CLASSIC CARS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (signed return receipt)) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *BROAD ARROW PRIVATE SALES, LLC d/b/a COLLECTORS GARAGE* (TTho) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *KENNETH AHN* (TTho) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8732309 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of state - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Magyar, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RM Auctions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conor T. Fitzpatrick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A. Michael Palizzi