This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 11:49:24 (UTC).

RLI Insurance Company et al v. Harvest King Trading USA, Limited et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 RLI Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Harvest King Trading USA, Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03173

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RLI Insurance Company

Seafood Doctor, Inc.

Defendants

Harvest King Trading USA, Limited

Coastal Corporation, Ltd.

Orient Overseas Container Line Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arturo E Matthews, Jr

Attorney at Matthews Law Firm Inc

2512 Chambers Road Suite 105

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorneys

Alberto J Campain

Attorney at Ecoff Campain and Tilles LLP

280 South Beverly Drive Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Lawrence C Ecoff

Attorney at Ecoff Campain and Tilles LLP

280 South Beverly Drive Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Qian Shen

Attorney at Holland and Knight LLP

400 South Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited, identifying Harvest King Trading USA, Limited. (Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited.(Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited.(Attorney Lawrence C Ecoff added to party Harvest King Trading USA, Limited(pty:dft))(Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#16

(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc., upon Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hoang Nguyen in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Qian Shen counsel for Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. Adding Qian (Sheila) Shen as counsel of record for Orient Overseas Container Line Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Attorney Qian Shen added to party Orient Overseas Container Line Limited(pty:dft))(Shen, Qian) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. upon Orient Overseas Container Line Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/11/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Qian Shen. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#13

(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Coastal Corporation, Ltd. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Seafood Doctor, Inc. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company identifying RLI Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33271472 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party RLI Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party Seafood Doctor, Inc.(pty:pla))(Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited, identifying Harvest King Trading USA, Limited. (Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited.(Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited.(Attorney Lawrence C Ecoff added to party Harvest King Trading USA, Limited(pty:dft))(Ecoff, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc., upon Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hoang Nguyen in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Qian Shen counsel for Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. Adding Qian (Sheila) Shen as counsel of record for Orient Overseas Container Line Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Attorney Qian Shen added to party Orient Overseas Container Line Limited(pty:dft))(Shen, Qian) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. upon Orient Overseas Container Line Limited waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/11/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Qian Shen. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Coastal Corporation, Ltd. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Harvest King Trading USA, Limited. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Seafood Doctor, Inc. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company identifying RLI Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33271472 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs RLI Insurance Company, Seafood Doctor, Inc.. (Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party RLI Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Arturo E Matthews, Jr added to party Seafood Doctor, Inc.(pty:pla))(Matthews, Arturo) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 30A ENTERPRISES DBA COASTAL DR is a litigant

Latest cases where Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARVEST KING TRADINGUSA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant