Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 06:44:41 (UTC).

R.J. v. Singh et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 R J filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R.J.

Defendants

Virtual Radiologic Corporation

Gagan Singh, M.D.

Virtual Radiologic Corporation doing business as vRad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee R. Bissonette

Attorney at Meyer Njus Tanick, PA

330 Second Avenue South, Ste. 350

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Christian C Mester

Attorney at McCarthy, Winkelman & Mester, LLP

4300 Forbes Boulevard, Suite 205

Lanham, MD 20706

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J. Novak

Attorney at Larson King LLP

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 2800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Mark A. Solheim

Attorney at Larson King LLP

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 2800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Michael C. Waller

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

100 W. Broadway, Suite 250, Po Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct date in order) (am). NEF regenerated on 6/28/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Gagan Singh, MD.(Waller, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Virtual Radiologic Corporation.(Novak, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

21 #1

Exhibit Supporting Documentation- Redline Copy

#21

(#21) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R.J.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation- Redline Copy)(Mester, Christian) Modified on 6/17/2019 to remove excess docket text and exhibit reference to attachment (am). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER Adopting #19 Stipulation, filed by R.J. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Plaintiff shall have 14 days to file its second amended complaint. (GD) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/12/2019 to correct caption) (am). NEF regenerated on 6/12/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

19 #2

Exhibit 2 - Redline 2nd Amend Comp

19 #1

Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint by R.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline 2nd Amend Comp)(Mester, Christian) Modified on 6/12/2019 to add exhibit numbers. (rh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#18

(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Garrett C. Burris, M.D. by R.J.. (Mester, Christian) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#8

(#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Gagan Singh, MD.(Waller, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

6 #1

[Proposed] Order

#6

(#7) (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation #6 by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Defendants shall have until 5/20/2019 to file answer to Plaintiff's complaint.(GD) Modified on 4/29/2019 to add link (cjs). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#4

(#5) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christian Mester. (as) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Gagan Singh, MD, Virtual Radiologic Corporation. (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by R.J. (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gagan Singh, M.D., Virtual Radiologic Corporation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000225) filed by R.J.(as) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct date in order) (am). NEF regenerated on 6/28/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Gagan Singh, MD.(Waller, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Virtual Radiologic Corporation.(Novak, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R.J.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation- Redline Copy)(Mester, Christian) Modified on 6/17/2019 to remove excess docket text and exhibit reference to attachment (am). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Adopting #19 Stipulation, filed by R.J. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Plaintiff shall have 14 days to file its second amended complaint. (GD) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/12/2019 to correct caption) (am). NEF regenerated on 6/12/2019 (am). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint by R.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline 2nd Amend Comp)(Mester, Christian) Modified on 6/12/2019 to add exhibit numbers. (rh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT of Garrett C. Burris, M.D. by R.J.. (Mester, Christian) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AFFIDAVIT of Patrick Rao, M.D. by R.J.. (Mester, Christian) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Virtual Radiologic Corporation.(Novak, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Gagan Singh, MD.(Waller, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R.J..(Mester, Christian) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DOCKET CORRECTION re: 7 Order Adopting Stipulation. Clerk's Office added link. (cjs) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Gagan Singh, MD answer due 5/20/2019; Virtual Radiologic Corporation answer due 5/20/2019. (rh) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation #6 by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Defendants shall have until 5/20/2019 to file answer to Plaintiff's complaint.(GD) Modified on 4/29/2019 to add link (cjs). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Gagan Singh, MD, Virtual Radiologic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Novak, Anthony) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christian Mester. (as) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christian C. Mester (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000229) by R.J. (as) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Gagan Singh, MD, Virtual Radiologic Corporation. (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by R.J. (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Gagan Singh, M.D., Virtual Radiologic Corporation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000225) filed by R.J.(as) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (as) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RJ is a litigant

Latest cases where Virtual Radiologic Corporation is a litigant