This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 07:41:06 (UTC).

R&J Entertainment LLC et al v. HCC Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 R J Entertainment LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HCC Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03782

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trapped! LLC

R&J Entertainment LLC a California limited liability company, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Trapped Escape Room

Defendants

Houston Casualty Company

HCC Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor J. Jacobellis

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

1160 Battery Street East, Suite 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel Jack Veroff

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

1160 Battery Street East, Suite 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

William F Merlin, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group PA

777 South Harbour Island Blvd., Ste. 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Adam M Moskowitz

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm PC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Adam A Schwartzbaum

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Shane Salvage Smith

Attorney at Merlin Law Group PA

777 S Harbour Island Blvd, Ste 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Cooper Mayer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jacqueline Clemence Karama

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

555 South Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

111 W. Houston, Ste 1800

San Antonio, TX 78205

 

Court Documents

#42

41 #7

Proposed Order

41 #6

Exhibit F

41 #5

Exhibit E

41 #4

Exhibit D

41 #3

Exhibit C

41 #2

Exhibit B

41 #1

Exhibit A

#41

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by R&J Entertainment LLC, Trapped! LLC, filed.(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Houston Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Lane, Daniel) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane S. Smith on behalf of R&J Entertainment LLC, Trapped! LLC, filed. (Smith, Shane) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Merlin, Jr. on behalf of R&J Entertainment LLC, Trapped! LLC, filed. (Merlin, William) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall move to dismiss the original complaint on or before December 17, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 19, 2021; Defendant shall file its Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before February 2, 2021..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Joint MOTION Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Houston Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Houston Casualty Company, filed.(Lane, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr. and Sumera Khan on behalf of HCC Specialty Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, filed. (Lane, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by R&J Entertainment LLC, Trapped! LLC, filed.(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Adam A. Schwartzbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Houston Casualty Company. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to HCC Specialty Insurance Company. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement re #5 Statement Plaintiff Trapped! LLCs Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 by R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Room, Trapped! LLC. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement re #4 Statement Plaintiff R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Rooms Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 by R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Room, Trapped! LLC. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement Plaintiff Trapped! LLCs Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 7.1 by R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Room, Trapped! LLC. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement Plaintiff R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Rooms Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 7.1 by R&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Room, Trapped! LLC. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HCC Specialty Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14870175.). Filed byR&J Entertainment LLC D/B/A Trapped Escape Room, Trapped! LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merlin, William) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCC Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHANE SALVAGE SMITH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor J. Jacobellis