This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 10:19:08 (UTC).

RIZZO v. NUTANIX, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 RIZZO filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against NUTANIX, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05140

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUEL P. RIZZO

Philadelphia, PA 19116

Defendants

PHILLIP SPEAR

MICHAEL GRANIT

NUTANIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSHUA DAVID MACEL

Attorney at WOLF BALDWIN & ASSOCIATES PC

800 East High St

Pottstown, PA 19426

BRUCE L. BALDWIN

Attorney at WOLF, BALDWIN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

800 E High St, Pobox 444

Pottstown, PA 19464

Defendant Attorneys

NINA K. MARKEY

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, PC

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102-1321

AARON J. CREUZ

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON

3 Parkway, 1601 Cherry St Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

KALEIGH HARTIGAN

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

Suite 1400, 1601 Cherry St.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.(HARTIGAN, KALEIGH) Modified on 9/8/2021 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; WRONG CASE) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

(#27) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS'S MOTION TO DISMISS #10 AND #19 ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3-31-2021. 3-31-2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/31/2021. 3/31/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. (MARKEY, NINA) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#24

(#24) Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRUCE L. BALDWIN on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO(BALDWIN, BRUCE) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#19

(#24) Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#10

(#20) Memorandum of Law re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Brief Regarding Statute of Limitations filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (BALDWIN, BRUCE) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.(HARTIGAN, KALEIGH) Modified on 9/8/2021 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; WRONG CASE) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTERVIDEO Conference held on 3/22/21. (JL ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS'S MOTION TO DISMISS #10 AND #19 ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3-31-2021. 3-31-2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/31/2021. 3/31/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. (MARKEY, NINA) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRUCE L. BALDWIN on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO(BALDWIN, BRUCE) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA DAVID MACEL on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO (MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM :ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 3/22/2021 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Memorandum of Law re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Brief Regarding Statute of Limitations filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (BALDWIN, BRUCE) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by NINA K. MARKEY on behalf of MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(MARKEY, NINA) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON J. CREUZ on behalf of MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(CREUZ, AARON) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMUEL P. RIZZO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(fdc, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. Forwarded To: Samuel P. Rizzo on 10/30/20 (fdc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE220271 (dmc, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDOC. #3 AND IFP FORM MAILED TO PRO SE SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (tomg, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY THE $400 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/20/2020. 10/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND IFP APPLICATION NOT E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF, INVALID EMAIL ADDRESS.(sg, ) Modified on 10/21/2020 (sg, ). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR, filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less