This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

RIZZO v. NUTANIX, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 RIZZO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NUTANIX, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD J. PAPPERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02640

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD J. PAPPERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUEL P. RIZZO

Defendants

PHILLIP SPEAR

NUTANIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA DAVID MACEL

Defendant Attorneys

NINA K. MARKEY

AARON J. CREUZ

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON J. CREUZ on behalf of NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(CREUZ, AARON) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.(MARKEY, NINA) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by NINA K. MARKEY on behalf of NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(MARKEY, NINA) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. NUTANIX, INC. waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; PHILLIP SPEAR waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketSummons Issued as to NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/7/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15184221.), filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO.(MACEL, JOSHUA) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less