This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:05:31 (UTC).

RIZNYK v. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 RIZNYK filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-10729

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN RIZNYK

Defendant

FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAMUEL A. DION

Attorney at DION & GOLDBERGER, ESQS.

1845 Walnut Street, Suite 1199

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

MAXINE J. NICHOLAS

Attorney at CORDON & REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

MICHAEL S. HANAN

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION identifying FFC Holding Corp., WEI Sales, LLC, Wells Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 2:30 PM, initiated by Plaintiffs counsel before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/02/2020. (jem) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION.(HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MAXINE J. NICHOLAS on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (NICHOLAS, MAXINE) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. HANAN on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRIAN RIZNYK. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (DION, SAMUEL) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11225589) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRIAN RIZNYK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DION, SAMUEL) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION identifying FFC Holding Corp., WEI Sales, LLC, Wells Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 2:30 PM, initiated by Plaintiffs counsel before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/02/2020. (jem) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION.(HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MAXINE J. NICHOLAS on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (NICHOLAS, MAXINE) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. HANAN on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/01/2020. (jem) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRIAN RIZNYK. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (DION, SAMUEL) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11225589) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRIAN RIZNYK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DION, SAMUEL) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less