This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2020 at 09:55:49 (UTC).

Rivers v. Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Rivers filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Rivers

Defendant

Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Shea Gober

Attorney at Townes Woods & Roberts PC

Po Box 96

Gardendale, AL 35071

Defendant Attorneys

Reed Robertson Bates

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

100 Brookwood Place, 7Th Floor

Birmingham, AL 35209

Alicia Medders Harrison

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

100 Brookwood Place, 7Th Floor

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/10/2020 as further set out in the order. If a party elects to complete the form requesting reassignment to a district judge, counsel must complete the attached form and mail it to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/13/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC.(Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

3 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #4

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Record

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2020-900844.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058888) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/10/2020 as further set out in the order. If a party elects to complete the form requesting reassignment to a district judge, counsel must complete the attached form and mail it to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/13/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC.(Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (Harrison, Alicia) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Keith Rivers. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC, filed by Keith Rivers. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2020-900844.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058888) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less