This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2021 at 08:21:45 (UTC).

Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association v. Rockhill Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rockhill Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01267

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association

Defendant

Rockhill Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Todd Mejeur

Attorney at Cohen Grossman

350 North Lake Destiny, Suite 300

Maitland, FL 32751

David William Davich

Attorney at Cohen Law Group

350 N. Lake Destiny Rd.

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Packer

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

Suite 1400, 200 W. Forsyth Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Irene Thaler

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue., Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mejeur, Jordan) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER to strike re: 14 Notice (Other) filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove it from the docket. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/1/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER directing compliance to #5 Initial Order. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint Case Management Report no later than October 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/20/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association. (Mejeur, Jordan) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Cohen Law Group, Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent State Auto Group, Corporate Parent Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association, Inc. for Rockhill Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

7 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

7 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rockhill Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to show cause by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/12/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: By Monday, August 23, 2021, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The response must be supported by evidence, which should be in the form of an affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

1 #7

State Court Other Documents State Court Documents

1 #6

State Court Docket Sheet State Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2020-31219 CICI filed in State Court on 09/09/2020. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18561885) filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/9/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mejeur, Jordan) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER to strike re: 14 Notice (Other) filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove it from the docket. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/1/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#14) (STRICKEN and REMOVED per Order #15) NOTICE of Service of Proposal for Settlement by Rockhill Insurance Company (Packer, Michael) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (LDJ). Modified text on 10/1/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSet deadline: Case management report due by 10/4/2021 (LDJ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER directing compliance to #5 Initial Order. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint Case Management Report no later than October 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/20/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/2/2021. (LLM) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association. (Mejeur, Jordan) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. (LLM) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Cohen Law Group, Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent State Auto Group, Corporate Parent Rivers Edge at Harbour Village Condominium Association, Inc. for Rockhill Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER discharging the Order to Show Cause (Doc. #4) in light of Defendant's Response (Doc. #6) and Amended Notice of Removal (Doc. #7). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/24/2021. (ABR) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rockhill Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to show cause by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/12/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSet deadline: Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2021 (LDJ) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: By Monday, August 23, 2021, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The response must be supported by evidence, which should be in the form of an affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/9/2021. (MB) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1267-RBD-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2020-31219 CICI filed in State Court on 09/09/2020. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18561885) filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Packer, Michael) Modified text on 8/9/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Irene Thaler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER