This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2021 at 22:03:05 (UTC).

RiverCity Properties, LLC et al v. The City of Belpre, Ohio et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 RiverCity Properties, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against The City of Belpre, Ohio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George C. Smith and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

George C. Smith

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RiverCity Properties, LLC

Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.

Defendants

Safety-Service Dir. Ronald D. Cross

The City of Belpre, Ohio

Not Classified By Court

Peter K Newman

Dayton, OH 45419

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Eric Chappelear

Attorney at Eastman & Smith

10 W. Broad Street, Suite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

Yazan S Ashrawi

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC

One Columbus, Suite 2300, 10 W. Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Tonya J. Rogers

Attorney at BAKER, DUBLIKAR, BECK, WILEY & MATHEWS

400 South Main Street

North Canton, OH 44720

Gregory A Beck

Attorney at Baker Dublikar Beck Wiley & Mathews - 2

400 S Main Street

North Canton, OH 44720

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Peter Kevin Newman

594 Garden Road

Dayton, OH 45419

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. (Ashrawi, Yazan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 8, 2021, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/11/2021. (daf) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#17

(#17) Proposed ORDER in re #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya) Modified text, terminated motion on 9/18/2020 (agm). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/22/2021. Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines (also Filed by Plaintiffs) by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. Withdrawl of Counsel (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.. (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RiverCity Properties, LLC. (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit 9 Cease and Desist Order

1 #8

Exhibit 8 Building Zoning Permit

1 #7

Exhibit 7 Building Permit Application

1 #6

Exhibit 6 April letter with enclosure

1 #5

Exhibit 5 October correspondence and revised lot layout

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Stormwater Pollution Prevention Plan

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Morgan Erosion &Sediment Control Earth Moving Permit Application

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Ron Eddy Response Letter June 6, 2018

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Belpre Response Letter May 10, 2018

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Beck, Gregory) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (er) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. (Ashrawi, Yazan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 8, 2021, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/11/2021. (daf) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/21/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2021. (agm) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/18/2020. (agm) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed ORDER in re #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya) Modified text, terminated motion on 9/18/2020 (agm). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/22/2021. Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines (also Filed by Plaintiffs) by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. Withdrawl of Counsel (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Mediation Conference: Mediation set for 9/2/2020 (agm) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Peter Newman assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (agm) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Beck, Gregory) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya J. Rogers for Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio (Rogers, Tonya) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Beck for Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio (Beck, Gregory) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to The City of Belpre, Ohio. (mdr) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Exhibit 2 Ron Eddy Response Letter June 6, 2018 by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. re #1 Complaint,(Chappelear, Stephen) Modified text on 1/31/2020 (mdr). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.. (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RiverCity Properties, LLC. (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs, filed by RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Belpre Response Letter May 10, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 Ron Eddy Response Letter June 6, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 Morgan Erosion &Sediment Control Earth Moving Permit Application, #4 Exhibit 4 Stormwater Pollution Prevention Plan, #5 Exhibit 5 October correspondence and revised lot layout, #6 Exhibit 6 April letter with enclosure, #7 Exhibit 7 Building Permit Application, #8 Exhibit 8 Building Zoning Permit, #9 Exhibit 9 Cease and Desist Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chappelear, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received: $400. Receipt Number: 0648-7308320. (ew) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter K. Newman