This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 07:12:09 (UTC).

Rivera v. Merchants Automotive Group Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Rivera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Merchants Automotive Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. James Lorenz and Barbara Lynn Major. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01472

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. James Lorenz

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miranda Korin Rivera

Defendants

Merchants Automotive Group Inc.

Glenn L. Dyer, Jr.

Fox Rent A Car Inc.

Does 1 through 50

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vy T. Nguyen

3055 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Gail Walther Richardson

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angelees, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

John H Everett

Attorney at Law Offices of John H. Everett

600 West Broadway, Ste. 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

George Vincent Manahan

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office

880 Front Street, Room 6293

San Diego, CA 92101-8893

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and Related Dates Until After Motion to Dismiss Resolved (ECF No. #17 ). Joint Discovery Plan due 12/10/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/3/21 are continued to 12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/13/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Continue ENE, CMC, and Associated Dates (second) by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jmo). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#16

(#16) REPLY - Other re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Richardson, Gail) (jmo). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

13 #1

Declaration of Gail Richardson

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Declaration of Gail Richardson

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Gail Richardson on behalf of Miranda Korin Rivera (Richardson, Gail)Attorney Gail Richardson added to party Miranda Korin Rivera(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Everett on behalf of Fox Rent A Car Inc., Merchants Automotive Group Inc. (Everett, John)Attorney John H Everett added to party Fox Rent A Car Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John H Everett added to party Merchants Automotive Group Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and related dates until after motion dismiss resolved. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/26/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

8 #1

Proof of Service

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/20/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/19/2021.(jpp) (dlg). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

6 #2

Proof of Service

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Campbell Declaration

6 #6

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and Related Dates Until After Motion to Dismiss Resolved (ECF No. #17 ). Joint Discovery Plan due 12/10/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/3/21 are continued to 12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/13/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Continue ENE, CMC, and Associated Dates (second) by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jmo). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY - Other re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Richardson, Gail) (jmo). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Richardson)(Richardson, Gail) (jpp). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Richardson)(Richardson, Gail) (jpp). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Gail Richardson on behalf of Miranda Korin Rivera (Richardson, Gail)Attorney Gail Richardson added to party Miranda Korin Rivera(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Everett on behalf of Fox Rent A Car Inc., Merchants Automotive Group Inc. (Everett, John)Attorney John H Everett added to party Fox Rent A Car Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John H Everett added to party Merchants Automotive Group Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and related dates until after motion dismiss resolved. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/26/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Continue ENE, CMC, and Associated Dates Until After MTD Resolved by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/20/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/19/2021.(jpp) (dlg). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Campbell Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (jpp). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Substitution of United States for Glenn L. Dyer Jr. by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scope of Employment Certification, #2 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Merchants Automotive Group Inc.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fox Rent A Car Inc. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, Fee Waived, filed by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1472-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Automotive Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX RENT A CAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Vincent Manahan