Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 07:16:49 (UTC).

Rivera Rodriguez v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Rivera Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80671

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Defendants

Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.

Apotex Corportion

Granules India, Ltd.

Apotex Inc

J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd.

Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ani Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Lannett Co, Inc.

Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.

Pharma USA, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Walgreens Co.

L. Perrigo Co.

Auro Health LLC

Ranbaxy Inc

Perrigo Company PLC

Perrigo Research & Development Company

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office P.S.C.

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-58 received from the United States District Court for the Southern District Court of Florida. (mg) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Minute ORDER-Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District Court of Florida. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-58 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 3/26/2021. (mg) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT Corrected against All Defendants, filed by Juana Virginia Rivera Rodriguez. Service due by 6/9/2021,(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket(#11) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01111 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80671-RLR on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01111. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Granting #2 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/5/2021. (MES) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-58 received from the United States District Court for the Southern District Court of Florida. (mg) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CTO-CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-58) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District Court of Florida re: MDL #2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 NEF, #2 Tag Along).(mg) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute ORDER-Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District Court of Florida. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-58 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 3/26/2021. (mg) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT Corrected against All Defendants, filed by Juana Virginia Rivera Rodriguez. Service due by 6/9/2021,(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7214649.), filed by Juana Virginia Rivera Rodriguez. Service due by 6/7/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J B Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd. is a litigant