This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 14:30:07 (UTC).

Rivera-Colon et al v. St. Bernard Parish et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Rivera-Colon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Bernard Parish. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01101

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fedmarie Calderon-Santos

Ivan Josue RIvera-Colon

Fedmarie Calderon Santos

Defendants

John Doe

C. Bordelon

James Pohlmann

Shanta Watkins

Parish of St. Bernard

State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Public Safety Services, Office of Motor Vehicles

Unidentified Parties

St. Bernard Parish

St. Bernard Parish Government

Department of Public Safety & Corrections State of Louisiana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George M. McGregor, Jr.

Attorney at Burgos & Associates, LLC

3535 Canal St., 2Nd Floor, Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

Cesar Roberto Burgos

Attorney at Burgos & Associates, LLC

3535 Canal St., 2Nd Floor, Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

Gabriel Omar Mondino

Attorney at Burgos & Associates, LLC

3535 Canal St., 2Nd Floor, Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

Robert J. Daigre

Attorney at Burgos & Associates, LLC

3535 Canal St., 2Nd Floor, Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Salvador E. Gutierrez, Jr.

Attorney at Gutierrez & Hand

2137 Jackson Boulevard

Chalmette, LA 70043

Mary Ann Hand

Attorney at Gutierrez & Hand

2137 Jackson Boulevard

Chalmette, LA 70043

Megan Teresa Suffern

Attorney at St. Bernard District Attorney's Office

2010 Pakenham Drive

Chalmette, LA 70043

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by St. Bernard Parish.Attorney Megan Teresa Suffern added to party St. Bernard Parish(pty:dft).(Suffern, Megan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by C. Bordelon, James Pohlmann.Attorney Mary Ann Hand added to party C. Bordelon(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ann Hand added to party James Pohlmann(pty:dft).(Hand, Mary) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (cwa). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to C. Bordelon, Department of Public Safety & Corrections State of Louisiana, James Pohlmann, St. Bernard Parish, Shanta Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(cg) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #6

Summons Watkins

1 #5

Summons St. Bernard

1 #4

Summons Pohlmann

1 #3

Summons DMV

1 #2

Summons Bordelon

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8245265) filed by Ivan Josue RIvera-Colon, Fedmarie Calderon-Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bordelon, #3 Summons DMV, #4 Summons Pohlmann, #5 Summons St. Bernard, #6 Summons Watkins)Attorney George M. McGregor, Jr added to party Fedmarie Calderon-Santos(pty:pla), Attorney George M. McGregor, Jr added to party Ivan Josue RIvera-Colon(pty:pla).(McGregor, George) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint. For all future filing, the caption on the pleading must be the same as the original Complaint. All plaintiffs and defendants must be listed. (cg) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by St. Bernard Parish.Attorney Megan Teresa Suffern added to party St. Bernard Parish(pty:dft).(Suffern, Megan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by C. Bordelon, James Pohlmann.Attorney Mary Ann Hand added to party C. Bordelon(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ann Hand added to party James Pohlmann(pty:dft).(Hand, Mary) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (cwa). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to C. Bordelon, Department of Public Safety & Corrections State of Louisiana, James Pohlmann, St. Bernard Parish, Shanta Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(cg) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8245265) filed by Ivan Josue RIvera-Colon, Fedmarie Calderon-Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bordelon, #3 Summons DMV, #4 Summons Pohlmann, #5 Summons St. Bernard, #6 Summons Watkins)Attorney George M. McGregor, Jr added to party Fedmarie Calderon-Santos(pty:pla), Attorney George M. McGregor, Jr added to party Ivan Josue RIvera-Colon(pty:pla).(McGregor, George) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.