This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2021 at 07:04:28 (UTC).

Rivera-Algarin et al v. Triple S Vida, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2021 Rivera-Algarin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Triple S Vida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01189

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Josefina Figueroa Lopez

Fabiola Marie Rivera Figueroa

Valeria Michel Rivera Figueroa

Their Conjugal Partnership

Jose Raul Rivera Algarin

Jose Raul Rivera-Algarin

Josefina Figueroa-Lopez

Fabiola Marie Rivera-Figueroa

Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Figueroa

Valeria Michel Rivera-Figueroa

Defendants

Triple S Salud, Inc.

Triple S Vida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle

Attorney at Andres Gorbea Law Office

157 Luna St.

San Juan, PR 00901

Defendant Attorney

Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio LLC

Po Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#6

5 #2

Summons Executed Triple S Salud, Inc.

5 #1

Summons Executed Triple S Vida, Inc.

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

2 #2

Summons Triple S Salud, Inc.

2 #1

Summons Triple S Vida, Inc.

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #4

Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination page 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination page 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple S Vida, Inc..(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple S Salud, Inc..(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint re: #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/4/2021. (ERC) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2021 to File Answer to Complaint re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Fabiola Marie Rivera Figueroa, Jose Raul Rivera Algarin, Their Conjugal Partnership, Josefina Figueroa Lopez, Valeria Michel Rivera Figueroa filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple S Salud, Inc., Triple S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 6/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Submitting Defendants' summons executed filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Triple S Vida, Inc., #2 Summons Executed Triple S Salud, Inc.)(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Triple S Salud, Inc., Triple S Vida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Triple S Salud, Inc., Triple S Vida, Inc. filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Triple S Vida, Inc., #2 Summons Triple S Salud, Inc.)(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Triple S Salud, Inc., Triple S Vida, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7275939.), filed by Valeria Michel Rivera Figueroa, Jose Raul Rivera Algarin, Their Conjugal Partnership, Josefina Figueroa Lopez, Fabiola Marie Rivera Figueroa. Service due by 7/26/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination page 1, #4 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination page 2, #5 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue)(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple S Vida, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIPS I-X is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez