This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:24:25 (UTC).

Rivera #239996 v. Ryan et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Rivera 239996 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are James F Metcalf (PS) and Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05742

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James F Metcalf (PS)

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Rivera

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendants

Unknown Lemus

Tara Diaz

G W Thompson

Joseph Profiri

Anthony Coleman

Charles L Ryan

Unknown Party

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to file on the court approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner and a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/12/2019. (SST) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Miguel Rivera. (24 pages) (GMP) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Miguel Rivera. (SST) (3 pages, titled "Leave to File a Emergency Motion for a Court Order for Protection Due to Extraordinary Circumstances and for Appropriate Relief of Cause") (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SST) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE - Certificate of Service by Miguel Rivera re: #1 Complaint. (SST) (1 page) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Plaintiff has 45 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint and to either pay the filing fees for this action or to submit an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 45 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/10/20. (GMP) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SST) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Plaintiff has 45 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint and to either pay the filing fees for this action or to submit an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 45 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/10/20. (GMP) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Miguel Rivera. (24 pages) (GMP) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to file on the court approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner and a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/12/2019. (SST) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SST) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SST) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE - Certificate of Service by Miguel Rivera re: #1 Complaint. (SST) (1 page) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Miguel Rivera. (SST) (3 pages, titled "Leave to File a Emergency Motion for a Court Order for Protection Due to Extraordinary Circumstances and for Appropriate Relief of Cause") (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.