This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:47:14

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Rivard against Glenview State Bank in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03338
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Finance - Consumer Credit
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Charlotte Troiana
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Glenview State Bank
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Kristin Rivard
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Plaintiff Ryan Rivard
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Plaintiff Stephen Rivard
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Rivard for presentment of exte...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Ryan Rivard for continuance to amen...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ORDER : The pro se complaint filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ri...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ryan Rivard (ek, ) (Ente...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ryan Rivard, Stephen Rivard, Kristin...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for continuance to amend complaint #6 is granted to 7/29/19. Motion hearing date of 7/1/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Rivard for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (cc, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Ryan Rivard for continuance to amend complaint (cc, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#5) ORDER : The pro se complaint filed by Plaintiff Ryan Rivard is dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Rivard has leave to file an amended complaint on his own behalf only within 28 days, if he can do so consistent with Rule 11. Mr. Rivard is encouraged to consult the courts Pro Se Help Desk. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/20/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ryan Rivard (ek, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ryan Rivard, Stephen Rivard, Kristin Rivard. (ek, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.