Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2020 at 07:21:28 (UTC).

RITE AID CORPORATION et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 RITE AID CORPORATION filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U S , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03367

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Defendants

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PLIVA, INC.

AKORN, INC.

EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.

SANDOZ, INC.

VERSAPHARM, INC.

VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL

UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC

HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.

MALLINCKRODT INC.

ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC

PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.

OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PFIZER INC.

G&W LABORATORIES, INC.

GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ERIC L. BLOOM

Attorney at HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL PUDLIN & SCHILLER

2805 Old Post Road, Suite 100

Harrisburg, PA 17110

MICHAEL L. KEELEY

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

950 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

NATHAN M. BUCHTER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GERALD E. ARTH

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St., 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SHERON KORPUS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

HECTOR TORRES

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

RACHEL ADCOX

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP HARKRIDER

950 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

DAVID M. MAX

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

EDWARD M. MATHIAS

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

90 State House Square

Hartford, CT 06103

CRAIG M. REISER

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

114 West 47Th St

New York, NY 10036

MARC E. KASOWITZ

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

RYAN THOMAS BECKER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market Street, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SETH B. DAVIS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

SETH A. MOSKOWITZ

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. (KASOWITZ, MARC) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG M. REISER on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(REISER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M. MATHIAS on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(MATHIAS, EDWARD) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ADCOX on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(ADCOX, RACHEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alvogen Pharma US, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALVOGEN INC..(KEELEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. KEELEY on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(KEELEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 7/9/2020 COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/28/2020. 7/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1467 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP..(BLOOM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. (KASOWITZ, MARC) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG M. REISER on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(REISER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M. MATHIAS on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(MATHIAS, EDWARD) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ADCOX on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(ADCOX, RACHEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alvogen Pharma US, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALVOGEN INC..(KEELEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. KEELEY on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(KEELEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 7/9/2020 COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/28/2020. 7/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1467 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Mylan N.V., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. E-mailed To: ERIC L. BLOOM, ESQ. on 7/10/2020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.. (fb) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP..(BLOOM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14411167.), filed by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(BLOOM, ERIC) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where G & W LABORATORIES is a litigant

Latest cases where VERSAPHARM, INC. is a litigant