This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2019 at 08:00:57 (UTC).

Ritchie v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 Ritchie filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A. Crow and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04067

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joey L Ritchie

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Walmart Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean M. McGivern

Attorney at Graybill & Hazlewood LLC

218 N. Mosley

Wichita, KS 67202-2806

Defendant Attorney

Christopher R. Hedican

Attorney at Baird Holm, LLP

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1500

Omaha, NE 68102-2068

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Joey L Ritchie.(McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) by Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#21

(#21) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/11/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/27/19. (ks) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#20

(#20) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#19

(#19) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sean M. McGivern on behalf of Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#18

(#18) Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (mls) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00682. Electronic file. (mls) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#16

(#16) Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/19 granting plaintiff's unopposed motion to transfer venue to the United States District of Kansas. The 5/23/19 case management conference is canceled. (Related Doc. #13 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Discovery Protocol Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

4 #2

4-2

4 #1

4-1

#4

(#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19 setting a conference for 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1)(D,MA)[Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #2

1-2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Amended Answer to Plaintff's Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Joey L Ritchie.(McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) by Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/11/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/27/19. (ks) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sean M. McGivern on behalf of Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (mls) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00682. Electronic file. (mls) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/19 granting plaintiff's unopposed motion to transfer venue to the United States District of Kansas. The 5/23/19 case management conference is canceled. (Related Doc. #13 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Stipulation & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/19 approving the parties' stipulation to correct defendant's name. (Related Doc. #12 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Attorney Appearance by Matthew S. Grimsley filed by on behalf of Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended Answer to Plaintff's Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Discovery Protocol Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19 setting a conference for 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1)(D,MA)[Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls). (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 911393 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9223332.. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant