This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2020 at 12:12:22 (UTC).

Ritchey v. C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Ritchey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against C M Smith Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thea Ritchey

Defendant

C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyler A. Larson

Attorney at Craig Henry PLC

401 W. Main Street, Suite 1900

Louisville, KY 40202

Michele Henry

Attorney at Craig Henry PLC

401 W. Main Street, Suite 1900

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer L. Bame

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

Robert D. Hudson

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Florence

7310 Turfway Road, Suite 210

Florence, KY 41042

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order denying Defendant's Motion

9 #1

Affidavit Exhibit A- Declaration of Thea Ritchey

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thea Ritchey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A- Declaration of Thea Ritchey, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Case Law- Mendoza v. Century Fast Foods, Inc., #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order denying Defendant's Motion) (Larson, Tyler) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

7 #3

Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit Exh. A - Declaration of C. Smith

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exh. A - Declaration of C. Smith, #3 Proposed Order) (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/9/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: counsel, TB (JM) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Meade Circuit Court #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B Declaration of C. Smith

1 #2

Exhibit A State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc. from Meade Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00112. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3113737, filed by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of C. Smith) (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thea Ritchey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A- Declaration of Thea Ritchey, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Case Law- Mendoza v. Century Fast Foods, Inc., #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order denying Defendant's Motion) (Larson, Tyler) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exh. A - Declaration of C. Smith, #3 Proposed Order) (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/9/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: counsel, TB (JM) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/5/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Meade Circuit Court #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc. from Meade Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00112. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3113737, filed by C&M Smith Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of C. Smith) (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler A. Larson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michele Henry