This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 10:09:54 (UTC).

RISSMILLER et al v. WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 RISSMILLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04799

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOD RISSMILLER

BRENDA RISSMILLER

Defendants and Cross Claimants

WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.

DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION

JHON CLEEF FLEURIVAL

JOHN DOES 1-4

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-4

Defendant and Cross Defendant

DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAUREN D. MCFADDEN

Attorney at LADDEY, CLARK & RYAN, ESQS.

60 Blue Heron Road

Sparta, NJ 07871-2600

ERIC G. KAHN

Attorney at JAVERBAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM & SININS

505 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081-3555

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

JEFFREY A. SEGAL

Attorney at SALMON, RICCHEZZA, SINGER & TURCHI, LLP

123 Egg Harbor Road, Suite 406

Sewell, NJ 08080

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (kht) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN D. MCFADDEN on behalf of TOD RISSMILLER (MCFADDEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., JHON CLEEF FLEURIVAL.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 10/26/2022 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/18/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC G. KAHN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KAHN, ERIC) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC G. KAHN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KAHN, ERIC) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 10/26/2022 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/18/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., JHON CLEEF FLEURIVAL.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN D. MCFADDEN on behalf of TOD RISSMILLER (MCFADDEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (kht) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (kht) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketJudge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey- Warren County, case number 000136-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13594233), filed by WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less