This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 09:02:23 (UTC).

Ripp v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Ripp filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi K. DuBose

Judges

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven John Ripp

Suite 307, FL 33133

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

BP America Production Company

2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605

Montgomery, AL 36104

Transocean Holdings, LLC

Transocean Deepwater, Inc.

1311 Broadfield Boulevard, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77084

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.

2 North Jackson Street, Suite 604

Montgomery, AL 36104

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elsa De Lima

Attorney at The Downs Law Group, P.A.

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Attachment A - Protective Order

2 #2

Attachment B - HIPAA Protective Order

2 #3

Attachment C

#3

(#3) OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING B3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. BP America Production Company waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Deepwater, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER STAYING CASE, pending final determination on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/4/2022. (meh) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#11

(#11) Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order. This action is transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana to be included as part of MDL No. 2179. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (meh) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#12

(#12) ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Eastern District of Louisiana, Case Number 2:22-CV-00919. (meh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of action to be included as part of MDL No. 2179. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (meh) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Eastern District of Louisiana, Case Number 2:22-CV-00919. (meh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order. This action is transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana to be included as part of MDL No. 2179. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (meh) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER STAYING CASE, pending final determination on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/4/2022. (meh) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Transocean Deepwater, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven John Ripp. BP America Production Company waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING B3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) B3 Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Protective Order, # 2 Attachment B - HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Attachment C). (cjr) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by David Durkee. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 21-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 19-cv-00447. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2978006, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2978005, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Steven John Ripp. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Deepwater, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant